EP1012716 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING A LOGICALLY CONSISTENT BACKUP USING MINIMAL DATA TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legato Systems Inc. 2350 West El Camino Real Mountain View California 94040 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Legato Systems Inc. 2350 West El Camino Real Mountain View, California 94040 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states VINCA CORPORATION Suite 2000, 1815 South State Street Orem, UT 84111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHRAN, Richard 71 West 4750 North Provo, UT 84604 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97946602.6 | 07.11.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US20406 | Priority number, date | US19960747151 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: US 747151 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820419 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012716 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012716 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/14 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
G06F11/1451 (EP,US);
G06F11/1466 (EP,US);
G06F2201/82 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM UNTERHALTEN EINES LOGISCH KONSISTENTEN BACKUPS UNTER VERWEDNUNG VON MINIMALEN DATEN-TRANSFER | [2000/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING A LOGICALLY CONSISTENT BACKUP USING MINIMAL DATA TRANSFER | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ASSURER UNE SAUVEGARDE A COHERENCE LOGIQUE A L'AIDE D'UN TRANSFERT DE DONNEES MINIMAL | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.2004 | DK | 06.08.2004 | ES | 17.08.2004 | AT | 07.11.2004 | SE | 08.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/13] | DK | 06.08.2004 | |
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
AT | 07.11.2004 | ||
SE | 08.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | DK | 06.08.2004 | |
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
SE | 08.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | DK | 06.08.2004 | |
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
SE | 08.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | DK | 06.08.2004 | |
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
SE | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | DK | 06.08.2004 | |
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | ES | 17.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0650122 (ROUZE GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 7* column 7, line 14 - line 57 *; | [XY]WO9612232 (VINCA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,13 * abstract * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 1 - line 21 * * page 11, line 9 - line 27 * * page 13, line 4 - page 15, line 3 * * figures 2,3,5 * [Y] 6,7,12,15; | [PY]US5574906 (MORRIS ROBERT J T [US]) [PY] 6,7 * column 11, line 12 - column 12, line 17 * * column 13, line 33 - column 14, line 4 *; | [Y] - "STORAGE MANAGEMENT MECHANISM FOR MANAGING SNAPSHOT PAGES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19920901), vol. 35, no. 4B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 26 - 29, XP000313841 [Y] 12,15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5163148 (WALLS KEITH [US]); | [YP]US5649196 (WOODHILL JAMES R [US], et al); | [YP]US5664186 (BENNETT ROBERT BRADLEY [US], et al); | [YE]US5689689 (MEYERS STEVEN C [US], et al) |