EP0938558 - GABA A RECEPTOR SUBUNIT EPSILON-RELATED PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUSTKA, Annemarie Werderstrasse 36 D-69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
GAUL, Renate Lilienstrasse 2 D-76189 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
WILKE, Klaus Schloss-Wolfsbrunnenweg 60 D-69118 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
KIOSCHIS, Petra Wielandstrasse 5 D-68542 Heddesheim / DE | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97946742.0 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997DE02499 | Priority number, date | DE1996144501 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644501 | [1999/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9818919 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938558 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, G01N33/68 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/70571 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | GABA A-REZEPTORUNTEREINHEIT EPSILON-VERWANDTES PROTEIN | [1999/35] | English: | GABA A RECEPTOR SUBUNIT EPSILON-RELATED PROTEIN | [1999/35] | French: | PROTEINE APPARENTEE A LA SOUS-UNITE DE RECEPTEUR GABA A EPSILON | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 03.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9606862 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9-11,13,14 * claims 1-23 *; | [PX] - DAVIES PA ET AL, "Insensitivity to anaesthetic agents conferred by a class of GABA(A) receptor subunit.", NATURE, FEB 27 1997, 385 (6619) P820-3, ENGLAND, XP002061235 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/385820a0 | [X] - HARVEY R.J., KIM H.C., DARLISON M.G., "Molecular cloning reveals the existence of a fourth gamma subunit of the vertebrate brain GABAA receptor", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (199310), vol. 331, pages 211 - 216, XP002061236 [X] 4-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(93)80339-V | [X] - EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES, EMBL, (1995), XP002061237 [X] 4,7,8 * abstract * | [X] - EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES, EMBL, (19961004), XP002061238 [X] 4,7,8 * abstract * |