EP0959495 - CONTAINER AND LOADER FOR SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Aza-Michinoue Kannabe-cho Fukuyama-shi Hiroshima-ken 720-2104 / JP | [2010/10] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Dainichi Shoji K.K. 4-15-13, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Michinoue, Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun, Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | |||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Dainichi Shoji K.K. 4-15-13, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Michinoue, Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun, Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | |||
For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION LTD. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHYAMA, Koji Dainichi Shoji K K 4-15-13, Shibaurra Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Toshiya Dainichi Shoji K K 4-15-13, Shhibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | 03 /
SAKIYA, Fumio@Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Aza-Michinoue Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | 04 /
KINPARA, Mineo@Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Aza-Michinoue Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | 05 /
FUJII, Toshiaki Ebara Research Corporation 4-2-1, Honfujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | 06 /
HORITA, Osamu Ebara Research Corporation 4-2-1, Honfujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | [2013/27] |
Former [1999/47] | 01 /
OHYAMA, Koji Dainichi Shoji K K 4-15-13, Shibaurra Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAYAMA, Toshiya Dainichi Shoji K K 4-15-13, Shhibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKIYA, Fumio Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Aza-Michinoue Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | |||
04 /
KINPARA, Mineo Rorze Corporation 1588-2, Aza-Michinoue Kannabe-cho Fukayasu-gun Hiroshima-ken 720-21 / JP | |||
05 /
FUJII, Toshiaki Ebara Research Corporation 4-2-1, Honfujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | |||
06 /
HORITA, Osamu Ebara Research Corporation 4-2-1, Honfujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97946808.9 | 01.12.1997 | [1999/47] | WO1997JP04372 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928965 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959495 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959495 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/677 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
H01L21/67772 (EP);
H01L21/68 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | H01L21/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/37] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SUBSTRATE | [1999/47] | English: | CONTAINER AND LOADER FOR SUBSTRATE | [1999/47] | French: | RECIPIENT ET CHARGEUR DE SUBSTRAT | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1999 | Translation filed | 30.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 11.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 02.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR | 22.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.07.2013 | GB | 01.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/24] | IT | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5664925 (MUKA RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 22 *; | [E]EP0827185 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [E] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH053240 (TDK CORP); | [A]JPH0637175 (EBARA CORP) | Examination | JPH09306975 | US4797054 | by applicant | JPH08279546 | US5664925 | DE19951011024 | DE19951042646 |