EP0938530 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE POUR-POINT OF PARAFFIN FEEDSTOCK WITH A NU-86 ZEOLITE BASED CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENAZZI, Eric 44, rue le Val Sablons F-78400 Chatou / FR | 02 /
GEORGE-MARCHAL, Nathalie 12 route du Millénaire F-69230 St Genis Laval / FR | [2003/19] |
Former [1999/35] | 01 /
BENAZZI, Eric 44, rue le Val Sablons F-78400 Chatou / FR | ||
02 /
GEORGE-MARCHAL, Nathalie 8, rue Geoffroy Saint Hilaire F-75005 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/51] |
Former [1999/35] | Andreeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 97947123.2 | 21.11.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997FR02113 | Priority number, date | FR19960014627 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: FR 9614627 | FR19960014628 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: FR 9614628 | [1999/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823706 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938530 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938530 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/64 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES STOCKPUNKTES VON PARAFFIN AUSGANGSSTOFFEN MIT EINEM AUF NU-86 ZEOLITH BASIERENDEN KATALYSATOR | [1999/35] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE POUR-POINT OF PARAFFIN FEEDSTOCK WITH A NU-86 ZEOLITE BASED CATALYST | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'AMELIORATION DU POINT D'ECOULEMENT DE CHARGES PARAFFINIQUES AVEC UN CATALYSEUR A BASE DE ZEOLITHE NU-86 | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | GB | 21.05.2003 | IE | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | LU | 21.11.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | CH | 30.11.2003 | LI | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
LU | 21.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
LU | 21.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
LU | 21.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 21.08.2003 | |
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4574043 (CHESTER ARTHUR W [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 10, line 60 - line 65 * * claims 1-4 *[A] 1,3,4,9-12,14; | [DYA]EP0463768 (ICI PLC [GB]) [DY] 1,3,4 * claims 1,11,12 * * page 7, line 12 - line 24 * * page 7, line 39 - line 44 * * page 9, line 18 - line 21 * [A] 1,3-6,8-10 |