EP0938411 - VARIABLE TENSION PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY MOVING LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASTMAN, Scott Lee 9207 NW 86th Terrace Kansas City, MO 64153 / US | 02 /
BRANDON, Robert, Griffiths 20 Bittersweet Court Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 03 /
CHAPDELAINE, Louis, Maurice 2123 Cloudview Court Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 04 /
COENEN, Joseph, Daniel 510 Lincoln Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 05 /
POPP, Robert Lee 805 Giese Street Hortonville, WI 54956 / US | 06 /
WOOLWINE, Devertt, DeWayne 126 Cheryl Ann Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947370.9 | 31.10.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US20167 | Priority number, date | US19960030684P | 13.11.1996 Original published format: US 30684 P | US19970057279P | 29.08.1997 Original published format: US 57279 P | US19970949404 | 14.10.1997 Original published format: US 949404 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821035 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938411 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938411 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/08, A61F13/15, B65H39/16, B65H23/188 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
B32B37/223 (EP,US);
A61F13/15772 (EP,US);
B32B38/1841 (EP,US);
B65H23/1886 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
B65H2511/512 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/512, B65H2220/01 (US,EP);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN BEWEGEN VON LAGEN UNTER VARIABLERSPANNUNG | [1999/35] | English: | VARIABLE TENSION PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY MOVING LAYERS | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TENSIONNEMENT VARIABLE POUR COUCHES CONTINUELLEMENT EN MOUVEMENT | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.08.2004 | ES | 11.08.2004 | FR | 11.08.2004 | DE | 12.11.2004 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/32] | BE | 11.08.2004 | |
FR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DE | 12.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | BE | 11.08.2004 | |
DE | 12.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 11.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4837715 (UNGPIYAKUL TANAKON [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13,19; | [A]US5235515 (UNGPIYAKUL TANAKON [US], et al)[A] 1,7,13,19; | [A]EP0589859 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [A] 1,7,13,19; | [A]WO9408789 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,7,13,19; | [PX]WO9724094 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [PX] 1-24; | [PA]WO9724283 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [PA] 1,7,13,19 |