EP0938608 - IMPROVED DRYING FOR PATTERNED PAPER WEBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAN, Dean, Van 6512 Tylers Crossing West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947482.2 | 14.11.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US20649 | Priority number, date | US19960748870 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: US 748870 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821405 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938608 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938608 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
D21F11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE TROCKNUNG VON GEMUSTERTEN PAPIERBAHNEN | [1999/35] | English: | IMPROVED DRYING FOR PATTERNED PAPER WEBS | [1999/35] | French: | SECHAGE AMELIORE POUR BANDES CONTINUES DE PAPIER A MOTIFS | [2002/46] |
Former [1999/35] | SECHAGE AMELIROE POUR BANDES CONTINUES DE PAPIER A MOTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 28.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | BE | 02.05.2003 | CH | 02.05.2003 | FI | 02.05.2003 | LI | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | IE | 14.11.2003 | LU | 14.11.2003 | [2005/03] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
LU | 14.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1073063 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2388076 (EBELING KARI [FI]) [A] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0140404 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-4,7,8* the whole document *; | [A]DE3600530 (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document * |