EP0941317 - INSULIN-LIKE GROWTH FACTOR 1 RECEPTOR (IGF-1R) ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-TREATED BREAST CANCER CELLS COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA Morrill Hall, 100 Church Street S.E. Minneapolis, MN 55455 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA Morrill Hall, 100 Church Street S.E. Minneapolis MN 55455 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Walter, C. 19845 Sweetwater Curve Shorewood, MN 55331 / US | 02 /
WALLENFRIEDMAN, Margaret, A. 6805 Limerick Lane Edina, MN 55439 / US | 03 /
CHIANG, Lan 4230 Underwood Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Olsen, Lars Pallisgaard, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Olsen, Lars Pallisgaard, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2003/02] | Olsen, Lars Pallisgaard, et al ZACCO DENMARK A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [1999/37] | Halberg, Kristian, et al Hofman-Bang & Boutard, Lehmann & Ree A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 97947515.9 | 14.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997US20815 | Priority number, date | US19960755558 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 755558 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822579 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941317 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941317 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K45/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/37] | C12N15/11, A61K45/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS BRUSTKREBSZELLEN, DIE MIT EINEM GEGEN DEN REZEPTOR FÜR INSULIN-ÄHNLICHEN WACHSTUMSFAKTOR GERICHTETEN ANTISENS-OLIGONUKLEOTIDBEHANDELT WORDEN SIND. | [1999/37] | English: | INSULIN-LIKE GROWTH FACTOR 1 RECEPTOR (IGF-1R) ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-TREATED BREAST CANCER CELLS COMPOSITION | [1999/37] | French: | COMPOSITION CONSTITUEE DE CELLULES D'UNE TUMEUR CANCEREUSE MAMMAIRE TRAITEES AVEC UN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ANTISENSE DIRIGE CONTRE LE RECEPTEUR DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE IGF DE TYPE 1 (IGF-1R) | [2002/13] |
Former [1999/37] | COMPOSITION DE CELLULES DE CARCINOME MAMMAIRE TRAITEES AVEC UN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ANTISENS DE RECEPTEUR DE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DE TYPE 1 (IGF-1R) TEL QUE L'INSULINE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 15.10.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2003 | BE | 12.03.2003 | FI | 12.03.2003 | GR | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | DK | 12.06.2003 | PT | 12.06.2003 | SE | 12.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | GB | 14.11.2003 | IE | 14.11.2003 | LU | 14.11.2003 | CH | 30.11.2003 | LI | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2005/03] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
GB | 14.11.2003 | ||
LU | 14.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
GB | 14.11.2003 | ||
LU | 14.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
LU | 14.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
LU | 14.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9422486 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [A] 8,11,17 * page 33; figure 7A *; | [A] - WALLENFRIEDMAN M A ET AL, "IGF - 1 R antisense and nonsense oligonucleotide therapy for 9L glioblastoma results in an immune response against an unrelated syngeneic tumor in Fischer 344 rats.", 26TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, D.C., USA, NOVEMBER 16-21, 1996. SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS 22 (1-3). 1996. 948. ISSN: 0190-5295, XP002055143 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - WALLENFRIEDMAN M A ET AL, "Effects of IGF-1R antisense and nonsense oligonucleotide administration on 9L glioblastoma and MAT B3 breast cancer tumor growth in Fischer 344 rats.", 87TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, WASHINGTON, D.C., USA, APRIL 20-24, 1996. PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING 37 (0). 1996. 354. ISSN: 0197-016X, XP002055144 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - BASERGA R, "Controlling IGF-receptor function: a possible strategy for tumor therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199605), vol. 14, no. 5, page 150-152, XP004035784 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(96)10023-8 | [PX] - WALLENFRIEDMAN M ET AL, "Peripheral vaccine for breast cancer: Insulin-like growth factor receptor ( IGF - 1R ) antisense oligonucleotide (AON) modified tumor cells protect against peripheral disease and brain metastases.", EIGHTY-EIGHTH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, APRIL 12-16, 1997. PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING 38 (0). 1997. 617. ISSN: 0197-016X, XP002055145 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * |