EP0946218 - BONDING BIO-ACTIVE MATERIALS TO SUBSTRATE SURFACES OF MEDICAL DEVICES VIA HYDROPHILIC SPACERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bay Street St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Meadox Medicals, Inc. 112 Bauer Drive Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATNAIK, Birendra, K. 13 South Gables Drive Chester, NJ 07930 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | du Pont, Jeroen Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | du Pont, Jeroen Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1999/40] | Bakkum, Ruben Joseph, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 97947597.7 | 18.11.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997US21215 | Priority number, date | US19960755187 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 755187 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823308 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946218 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946218 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, A61L31/00, A61L33/00 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
A61L33/0029 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/42 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L33/0029, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [1999/40] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE GERÄTE MIT BESCHICHTUNG AUS DURCH HYDROPHILESPACERGRUPPEN GEBUNDENEM BIOAKTIVEN MATERIAL | [1999/40] | English: | BONDING BIO-ACTIVE MATERIALS TO SUBSTRATE SURFACES OF MEDICAL DEVICES VIA HYDROPHILIC SPACERS | [1999/40] | French: | LIAISON DE MATERIAUX BIOACTIFS A LA SURFACE DE SUBSTRATS D'INSTRUMENTS MEDICAUX PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'ESPACEURS HYDROPHILES | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0263184 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-22,25 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 10 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,6,11 *; | [X]WO8905616 (BIO METRIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-25,27 * page 5, line 25 - line 35 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, line 3 - line 8 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 8 - line 16 * * page 11, line 14 - line 25 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * examples 1,3 *; | [X]WO9000343 (CARDIOPULMONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,13-22,25 * page 6, line 2 - line 17 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 3 * * page 7, line 14 - line 18 * * page 34, line 23 - line 33 * * page 36, line 18 - page 37, line 3 *; | [X]WO9115952 (CARDIOPULMONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,13-22,25 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 19 * * page 6, line 31 - line 35 * * page 24, line 10 - line 20 * * page 26, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]US5436291 (LEVY ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 28-31 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 9 * * column 13, line 59 - column 14, line 10 * * column 15, line 36 - line 54 ** claims 20,21,24 *; | [X] - KI DONG PARK ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF SPUU-PEO-HEPARIN GRAFT COPOLYMERS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (19911101), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 1725 - 1737, XP000261976 [X] 1-3,8,9,11,13-15,20-22,25,26 * abstract * * page 1726, column L, paragraph 2 - page 1728, column L, paragraph 1 * |