EP0947083 - TELEPHONE DIRECTORY APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHRER, Timothy, Joseph 22 Fourth Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1S 2K9 / CA | 02 /
McCLENNON, Robert, Scott 209 Chandler Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2C 0G3 / CA | 03 /
CUDDY, David, Robert 205 Faraday Street Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 3M5 / CA | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/40] | Funnell, Samantha Jane, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947674.4 | 11.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997CA00961 | Priority number, date | US19960767499 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: US 767499 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827706 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947083 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947083 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/274 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
H04M1/56 (EP,US);
H04M1/2746 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M1/271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/40] | Title | German: | FERNSPRECHVERZEICHNISGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | [1999/40] | English: | TELEPHONE DIRECTORY APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1999/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF REPERTOIRE DE NUMEROS DE TELEPHONE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07336426 ; | [X]JPH06121014 ; | [X]JPH0795279 ; | [A]EP0408041 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 114-130 * abstract * * column 8, lines 51-56 *; | [X]EP0477854 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-9,15-19,32-39,76-88,102-113 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5274699 (RANZ STEPHEN J [US]) [Y] 12-14,25-31,63-75,95-101 * column 1, line 22 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0647075 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 114-130* the whole document *; | [XY]US5467383 (URASAKA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,15-24,32-62,76-94,102-113 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14,25-31,63-75,95-101,118-130; | [X]GB2292043 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,32,76,102,108 * page 6, line 9 - page 8, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0709996 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,15-19,32-39,76-88,102-113 * column 5, line 24 - column 7, line 52; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]US5581611 (YUNOKI HIDEO [JP]) [X] 114-117 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 35; figures 1,2 * [Y] 118-130; | [PX]WO9719546 (AT & T CORP [US]) [PX] 1,32,76,102,108 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07336426 A 19951222 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,32,76,102,108 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940729), vol. 018, no. 407, Database accession no. (E - 1586), & JP06121014 A 19940428 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,32,76,102,108 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07095279 A 19950407 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,32,76,102,108 * abstract * |