EP0943102 - DETECTION SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING POSITIONAL AND OTHER INFORMATION ABOUT OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Laboratories - Cambridge Limited Old Addenbrookes Site, 24A Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states AT&T Laboratories - Cambridge Limited Old Addenbrookes Site, 24A Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1QA / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states OLIVETTI RESEARCH LIMITED Old Addenbrookes Site, 24A Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1QA / GB | ||
For all designated states ORACLE CORPORATION 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Alan, Henry 128 Brampton Road Cambridge CB1 3HL / GB | 02 /
WARD, Andrew, Martin, Robert 94 Catherine Street Cambridge CB1 3AR / GB | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al KEITH W. NASH & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947785.8 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997GB03359 | Priority number, date | GB19960025208 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9625208 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828634 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943102 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943102 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/16, G01S5/30, G01S15/87 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G01S11/16 (EP,US);
G01S15/876 (EP,US);
G01S5/186 (EP,US);
G01S5/30 (EP,US);
G01S13/878 (EP,US);
G01S15/872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION UND ANDERER OBJEKTBEZOGENER INFORMATION | [1999/38] | English: | DETECTION SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING POSITIONAL AND OTHER INFORMATION ABOUT OBJECTS | [1999/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION D'OBJETS ET DE RECUEILLIR TOUTE AUTRE INFORMATION LES CONCERNANT | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.2002 | BE | 03.04.2002 | CH | 03.04.2002 | FI | 03.04.2002 | GR | 03.04.2002 | IT | 03.04.2002 | LI | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | PT | 03.07.2002 | SE | 03.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | IE | 04.12.2002 | LU | 04.12.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
FI | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
IE | 04.12.2002 | ||
LU | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
IE | 04.12.2002 | ||
LU | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
IE | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 03.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3777305 (STOUTMEYER R) [A] 20,58,65* the whole document *; | [Y]WO8801392 (MITRE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12,14,16,17,21,22,24,48,52,97,99 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 11 * * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 11 *; | [Y]US4853863 (COHEN EDWIN [US], et al) [Y] 65 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 28 *; | [YA]EP0485879 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 50 * column 4, line 31 - line 36; claim 10 * [A] 20,58,65; | [A]US5359575 (WILLIAMS ROSS E [US], et al) [A] 50,51,73-79 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 17 * * column 7, line 57 - line 60 * * column 8, line 7 - line 10 *; | [XDY]WO9514241 (WYBRON INC [US]) [XD] 15 * page 6, line 7 - page 11, line 10 * [Y] 1-12,14,16,17,20-22,24,48,50,52,58,65,97,99; | [A]WO9527963 (LEW HELEN [IL], et al) [A] 1,17-19,21-38,40-49,59,60,97 * page 4, line 16 - page 13, line 9 *; | [YA]GB2298098 (TAGWARE LTD [GB]) [Y] 20,58 * page 5, line 13 - line 15 * * page 6, line 1 - line 13 * * page 7, line 15 - line 21 * [A] 65,73-79 |