EP0944779 - DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. 5725 Delphi Drive Troy, MI 48098-2815 / US | [2001/33] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Technology Limited Cawston House, Cawston Lane Rugby, Warwickshire CV22 7SA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNKER, Kenneth, James 39A Mill Road Rearsby Leicester LE7 4YN / GB | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2001/33] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | Drury, Peter Lawrence, et al T&N plc, Manchester International Office Centre, Styal Road Manchester M22 5TN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947805.4 | 08.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997GB03387 | Priority number, date | GB19960025862 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9625862 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826191 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944779 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944779 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/40 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
F16D55/40 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2055/0008 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0062 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE | [1999/39] | English: | DISC BRAKE | [1999/39] | French: | FREIN A DISQUE | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2003 | BE | 21.05.2003 | CH | 21.05.2003 | FR | 21.05.2003 | IT | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | NL | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | ES | 01.09.2003 | GB | 08.12.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
GB | 08.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
GB | 08.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5783733 ; | [X]US2943827 (HARTEL ERWIN H, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 2 *; | [A]US3208559 (CHAMBERS WARREN D, et al) [A] 1 * figure . * * column 2, line 12 - line 34 * * column 2, line 44 - line 55 *; | [A]US3494448 (RUPRECHT ROBERT, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure .; claims 1-3 * * column 1, line 31 - line 70 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]DE2739128 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1 * figure - ** page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 21 *; | [Y]WO8905924 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * page 10, line 21 - page 13, line 29 *; | [A]US5472068 (WEILER ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 14 * * column 4, line 13 - line 33 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820907), vol. 006, no. 172, Database accession no. (M - 154), & JP57083733 A 19820525 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |