EP0954121 - Mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/44] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2012/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Yoshinori, @Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kuniyuki Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 yo 100 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [1999/44] | 01 /
UCHIDA, Yoshinori, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Kuniyuki Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 yo 100 / JP | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/03] |
Former [1999/44] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947886.4 | 10.12.1997 | [1999/44] | WO1997JP04551 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930442 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954121 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954121 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/22, H04W52/26, H04W52/36 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H04W52/26 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W88/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | H04B7/26, H04B7/005, H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22 | ||
Former IPC [1999/44] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/44] | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationssystem | [2012/48] | English: | Mobile communication system | [2012/48] | French: | Système de communication mobile | [2012/48] |
Former [1999/44] | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [1999/44] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [1999/44] | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1999 | Translation filed | 09.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05009376.4 / EP1565012 | EP05026734.3 / EP1641141 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | [2013/49] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0584029 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 6 *; | [A]WO9507578 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * page 8, line 24 - line 34 * * page 9, line 14 - line 30 *; | [A]US5327576 (UDDENFELDT JAN [SE], et al) [A] 13 * abstract * * column 7, line 18 - line 32 *; | [A]US5533004 (JASPER STEVEN C [US], et al) [A] 14-17 * abstract * * column 7, line 14 - line 27 *; | [A]US5602831 (GASKILL GAROLD B [US]) [A] 18-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - line 53 *; | [A]WO9726739 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 24-26 * page 8, line 15 - line 26 *; | [A]US5432790 (HLUCHYJ MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 27-29 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - line 68 * | International search | [X]JPH09312649 (NEC CORP); | [X]JPH07231479 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0897824 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH08130766 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH07203116 (MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNIC) | by applicant | WO9507578 |