EP0885704 - CARBON FIBER PREPREG AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Hideo 3-1-B5-208, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520 / JP | 02 /
ODAGIRI, Nobuyuki 1-31, Higashiterao-kitadai Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230 / JP | 03 /
TERASHITA, Takeshi 672-5, Oaza Tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-31 / JP | 04 /
KISHI, Hajime 3-1-401, Oguri 7-chome Matsuyama-shi Ehime 790 / JP | 05 /
YAMANE, Shoji 1415-A2-6, Oaza Tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-31 / JP | [2003/13] |
Former [1998/52] | 01 /
NAGATA, Hideo 3-1-B5-208, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520 / JP | ||
02 /
ODAGIRI, Nobuyuki 1-31, Higashiterao-kitadai Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230 / JP | |||
03 /
TERASHITA, Takeshi 672-5, Oaza Tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-31 / JP | |||
04 /
KISHI, Hajime 3-1-401, Oguri 7-chome Matsuyama-shi Ehime 790 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMANE, Shoji 1451-A2-6, Oaza Tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-31 / JP | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947964.9 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997JP04642 | Priority number, date | JP19960338477 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33847796 | [1998/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826912 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885704 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885704 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29B11/16, C08J5/24, B32B5/28 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
B29B15/105 (EP,US);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
B29K2307/00 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2477/00 (EP,US);
C08J2481/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24994 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L81/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/52] | Title | German: | KOHLEFASERPREPREGS UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/52] | English: | CARBON FIBER PREPREG AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1998/52] | French: | PRE-IMPREGNE DE FIBRES DE CARBONE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1998 | Translation filed | 17.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 17.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH079444 ; | [A]JPS55128434 ; | [A]JPS61106634 ; | [A]WO9009410 (HEXCEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4957801 (MARANCI ARTUN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 6 - line 13 * * column 9, line 3 - line 15; examples 11,12 *; | [A]US5025045 (GAWIN IRENA [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 9 *; | [A]EP0564235 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 28 - line 42 *; | [X]US5268223 (QURESHI SHAHID P [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 11, line 20 - line 33; example 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 12, Database accession no. 95-084853, XP002088293 & JPH079444 A 19950113 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 46, Database accession no. 80-81853C, XP002088294 & JPS55128434 A 19801004 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860930), vol. 010, no. 287, Database accession no. (C - 375), & JP61106634 A 19860524 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5580531 (TOHO BESLON CO); | [A]JPH01104624 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH02227212 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JPH07118414 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) |