EP0944560 - FINISHING MORTAR FOR SOUND-ABSORBING COATING OF INNER WALLS, CEILINGS AND THE LIKE IN BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fellert, John Reginsgatan 4 502 55 Boras / SE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Graudums, Valdis Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Graudums, Valdis Albihns Patentbyra Göteburg AB P.O.Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 97948100.9 | 12.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997SE02072 | Priority number, date | SE19960004599 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: SE 9604599 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827027 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944560 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944560 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/45, // C04B14/12, C04B16/02 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00482 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00577 (EP,US);
C04B2111/52 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US);
Y10S106/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/04, C04B14/18, C04B18/24, C04B18/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | PUTZ FÜR DIE SCHALLABSORBIERENDE BESCHICHTUNG VON INNENWÄNDEN, DECKEN UND DERGLEICHEN IN BAUWERKEN | [1999/39] | English: | FINISHING MORTAR FOR SOUND-ABSORBING COATING OF INNER WALLS, CEILINGS AND THE LIKE IN BUILDINGS | [1999/39] | French: | ENDUIT DE FINITION SERVANT D'ISOLANT PHONIQUE POUR PAROIS INTERIEURES, PLAFONDS ET SIMILAIRES D'IMMEUBLES | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.07.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/17] | SE | 25.07.2001 | |
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 25.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2620865 |