EP0938610 - METHOD OF DRYING A PAPER WEB HAVING BOTH BULK AND SMOOTHNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAN, Dean, Van 6512 Tylers Crossing West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2004/11] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 97948257.7 | 14.11.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US20643 | Priority number, date | US19960748768 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: US 748768 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821404 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938610 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938610 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP);
D21F11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TROCKNUNG VON EINER VOLUMINÖSEN, GLATTEN PAPIERBAHN | [1999/35] | English: | METHOD OF DRYING A PAPER WEB HAVING BOTH BULK AND SMOOTHNESS | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE SECHAGE D'UNE BANDE CONTINUE DE PAPIER A LA FOIS BOUFFANTE ET LISSEE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BE | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | FR | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | IT | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | SE | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/08] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IT | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1073063 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2388076 (EBELING KARI [FI]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0140404 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]DE3600530 (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * |