EP1006784 - GLUTATHIONE-S-CONJUGATE TRANSPORT IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania Center for Technology Transfer 3700 Market Street Suite 300 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA Center for Technology Transfer, 3700 Market Street, Suite 300 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REA, Philip, A. 2941 Berkley Road Ardmore, PA 19003 / US | 02 /
LU, Yu-Ping 2403 Manor Avenue Havertown, PA 19083 / US | 03 /
LI, Ze-Sheng Apartment 3A, 211 Lazaretto Road Prospect Park, PA 19076 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | King, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97948442.5 | 18.11.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US21336 | Priority number, date | US19960031040P | 18.11.1996 Original published format: US 31040 P | US19970061328P | 08.10.1997 Original published format: US 61328 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821938 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006784 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/00, C07K14/415, C07K16/16, C12N1/13, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/29, C12N15/64, C12N15/82 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/8241 (EP,US);
C07K14/395 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | TRANSPORT VON GLUTATHION-S-KONJUGATION IN PFLANZEN | [2000/24] | English: | GLUTATHIONE-S-CONJUGATE TRANSPORT IN PLANTS | [2000/24] | French: | TRANSPORT INDUIT PAR DES CONJUGUES S DE GLUTATHION DANS DES VEGETAUX | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX] - SZCZYPKA MARK S ET AL, "A yeast metal resistance protein similar to human cystic fibrosis transmembrane conductance regulator (CTFR) and multidrug resistance-associated protein.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, no. 36, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22853 - 22857, XP002143124 [DX] 14 * figure 1 * | [PX] - TOMMASINI ROBERTO ET AL, "Differential expression of genes coding for ABC transporters after treatment of Arabidopsis thaliana with xenobiotics.", FEBS LETTERS 1997, (1997), vol. 411, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 206 - 210, XP000919207 [PX] 1-13,15-20 * page 207, column 2 - page 210, column 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00702-3 | [A] - TOMMASINI ROBERTO ET AL, "Transport of oxidized glutathione into barley vacuoles: Evidence for the involvement of the glutathione-S-conjugate ATPase.", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFORSCHUNG SECTION C BIOSCIENCES 1993, (1993), vol. 48, no. 11-12, ISSN 0939-5075, pages 867 - 871, XP000916674 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [T] - BIOSCIENCE REPORTS, 1997, Vol. 17, No. 2, ISHIKAWA T. et al., "The GS-X Pump in Plant, Yeast and Animal Cells: Structure, Function and Gene Expression", pages 189-207. | [A] - PLANT PHYSIOL., 1995, Vol. 107, LI Z.S. et al., "Magnesium Adenosine 5'-Triphosphate-Energized Transport of Glutathione-S-Conjugates by Plant Vacuolar Membrane Vesicles", pages 1257-1268. | [T] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., January 1997, Vol. 94, LI Z.S. et al., "A New Pathway for Vacuolar Cadmium Sequestration in Saccharomyces Cerevisiae: YCF1-Catalyzed Transport of Bis(Glutathionato)Cadmium", pages 42-47. | [T] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., July 1997, Vol. 94, LU Y.P. et al., "AtMRP1 Gene of Arabidopsis Encodes a Glutathione S-Conjugate Pump: Isolation and Functional Definition of a Plant ATP-Binding Cassette Transporter Gene", pages 8243-8248. | [A] - NATURE, 15 July 1993, Vol. 364, MARTINOLA E. et al., "ATP-Dependent Glutathione S-Conjugate 'Export' Pump in the Vacuolar Membrane of Plants", pages 247-249. | [A] - J. BIOL. CHEM., 15 March 1996, Vol. 271, No. 11, LI Z.S. et al., "The Yeast Cadmium Factor Protein (YCF1) is a Vacuolar Glutathione S-Conjugate Pump", pages 6509-6517. |