EP1006941 - MICROPOROUS TUBULAR PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiance Medical Systems, Inc. 13700 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Radiance Medical Systems Inc. 13700 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONALD, Edward, A. 38 Nighthawk Irvine, CA 92714 / US | 02 /
HENSON, Michael 2 Via Presea Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Joe, W. 28352 Chat Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 04 /
ROSENBLUTH, Robert 24161 Cherry Hill Place Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 05 /
BRENNEMAN, Rodney 34002 Las Palmas del Mar San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97948450.8 | 21.11.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US21366 | Priority number, date | US19960754816 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: US 754816 | US19970881956 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: US 881956 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822045 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006941 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2/92 (EP,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/0077 (EP,US);
A61F2/856 (EP,US);
A61F2/954 (EP,US);
A61F2002/826 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8483 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0095 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | MIKROPORÖSE ROHRFÖRMIGE PROTHESE | [2000/24] | English: | MICROPOROUS TUBULAR PROSTHESIS | [2000/24] | French: | PROTHESE TUBULAIRE MICROPOREUSE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 14.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5344426 (LAU LILIP [US], et al); | [A]US5441515 (KHOSRAVI FARHAD [US], et al) |