EP0956662 - SDMA PACKET RADIO SYSTEM AND CHANNEL ESTABLISHMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONKASALO, Harri 2800 L Don Dodson 1137 Bedford, TX 76021 / US | 02 /
HONKASALO, Zhi-Chun 2800 L Don Dodson 1137 Bedford, TX 76021 / US | 03 /
HÄMÄLÄINEN, Jari Nallekarhuntie 20 FIN-36100 Kangasala / FI | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97948921.8 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997FI00814 | Priority number, date | FI19960005177 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: FI 965177 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828864 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956662 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H04B7/2618 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP);
H04W16/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | SDMA PAKETFUNKANORDNUNG UND KANALAUFBAUVERFAHREN | [1999/46] | English: | SDMA PACKET RADIO SYSTEM AND CHANNEL ESTABLISHMENT METHOD | [1999/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION SDMA PAR PAQUETS ET PROCEDE D'ETABLISSEMENT DE VOIE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 02.09.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0670640 (TELIA AB [SE]); | [Y]EP0399610 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO9637976 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]EP0696112 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0729285 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) |