EP0948415 - ROLLER SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Technology Oy Riihitontuntie 7 02201 Espoo / FI | [2002/49] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Outokumpu Technology Oy Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÄÄNÄNEN, Eero Pihlajasaarentie 46 FIN-95420 Tornio / FI | 02 /
JANKKILA, Martti Meurmannintie 7 FIN-95410 Kiviranta / FI | 03 /
MUSTIKKA, Lauri Parkkitie 1 D 13 FIN-95410 Kiviranta / FI | 04 /
RANTALA, Pekka Närerinne 12 FIN-95450 Tornio / FI | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Zipse & Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97948937.4 | 22.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997FI00830 | Priority number, date | FI19960005255 | 30.12.1996 Original published format: FI 965255 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829201 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948415 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948415 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/14 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B07B1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, GR, IT, SE [1999/41] | Extension states | AL | 30.07.1999 | Title | German: | ROLLBLENDE | [1999/41] | English: | ROLLER SCREEN | [1999/41] | French: | TAMIS A ROULEAUX | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.12.2002 | [2003/20] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1482439 (GROSSKOPF WILLI); | [A]US4148398 (MUSTIKKA LAURI A); | [A]US4209097 (DRUGGE ROBERT [SE], et al); | [X]DE4017652 (GAZ INDUSTRIEANLAGEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]AT1000U (FALCH YVONNE [AT]) |