EP0948524 - PEPTIDES AGONISTS OF BRADYKININE B 2? RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOURNIER INDUSTRIE ET SANTE 38, avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODEY, Pierre 10, rue des Champs d'Aloux F-21121 Fontaine-lès-Dijon / FR | 02 /
LUCCARINI, Jean-Michel 9, rue de Cronstadt F-21000 Dijon / FR | 03 /
MARTINEZ, Jean Chemin des Romains F-34570 Saussan / FR | 04 /
AMBLARD, Muriel 54, avenue de Maurin F-34070 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
DAFFIX, Isabelle L'Orangeraie, 12, rue Abbé de l'Epe F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1999/41] | Clisci, Serge, et al S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97948993.7 | 03.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997FR02193 | Priority number, date | FR19960014890 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9614890 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824809 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948524 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/18, C07K5/078, A61K38/10 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
A61P15/04 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K7/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | PEPTIDANTAGONISTEN DES BRADYKININ B2-REZEPTORS | [1999/41] | English: | PEPTIDES AGONISTS OF BRADYKININE B 2? RECEPTOR | [1999/41] | French: | PEPTIDES AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR B 2? DE LA BRADYKININE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 03.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4477464 (SLADE JOEL [US], et al) [X] 10* example 13 *; | [X]DE3423743 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 10 * example 18; claim 2 *; | [X]US4512988 (WELLER III HAROLD N [US], et al) [X] 10 * examples 29E,29F *; | [A]EP0322779 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9507294 (SCIOS NOVA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9524422 (CORTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 45; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5552397 (KARANEWSKY DONALD S [US], et al) [X] 10 * examples 1B,2B,14A,16D * * example 22A * |