EP0944813 - DISTRIBUTED STRAIN AND TEMPERATURE SENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensornet Limited 198 Providence Square Jacob Street London SE1 2DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Sensornet Limited 198 Providence Square Jacob Street London SE1 2DZ / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states Sensornet Limited 12 Chequer Lane Ely, Cambridgeshire CB7 4LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARHADIROUSHAN, Mahmoud 12 Fulmer House, Mallory Street London NW8 8TA / GB | 02 /
PARKER, Tom, Richard Smiths Farm, Washfield Tiverton, Devon EX16 9RF / GB | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949063.8 | 16.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997GB03454 | Priority number, date | GB19960026099 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9626099 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827406 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944813 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944813 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
G01D5/35364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE SPANNUNG- UND TEMPERATURMESSSYSTEM | [2003/17] | English: | DISTRIBUTED STRAIN AND TEMPERATURE SENSING SYSTEM | [1999/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE CONTRAINTE ET DE TEMPERATURE REPARTIES | [1999/39] |
Former [1999/39] | VERTEILTES SPANNUNGS- UND TEMPERATURMESSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Request for further processing for: | 16.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | IE | 16.12.2004 | LU | 16.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 16.12.2004 | ||
LU | 16.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 16.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A] - WAIT P C ET AL, "LANDAU PLACZEK RATIO APPLIED TO DISTRIBUTED FIBRE SENSING", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (19960101), vol. 122, no. 4/06, pages 141 - 146, XP000548781 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(95)00557-9 | [A] - TOSHIO KURASHIMA, "BRILLOUIN OPTICAL-FIBER TIME DOMAIN REFLECTOMETRY", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19930401), vol. E76-B, no. 4, pages 382 - 389, XP000378270 [A] 1-3 * figure 9 * |