EP1008046 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED NETWORK-WIDE SURVEILLANCE AND SECURITY BREACH INTERVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Computer Associates Think, Inc. One Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11749 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states COMPUTER ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL, INC. 1 Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11788-7000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESBENSEN, Daniel 2657 Mo'Olio Place Kihei, HI 96753 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949535.5 | 21.11.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US21322 | Priority number, date | US19960749352 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: US 749352 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822875 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008046 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008046 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F13/00, H04L12/26 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
G06F11/00 (KR);
H04L43/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | G06F11/00, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN NETZWERKWEITEN ÜBERWACHUNG UND INTERVENTION BEI EINBRUCH IN DIE SICHERHEIT | [2009/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED NETWORK-WIDE SURVEILLANCE AND SECURITY BREACH INTERVENTION | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE AUTOMATISEE A L'ECHELLE D'UN RESEAU ET D'INTERVENTION EN CAS D'ATTEINTE A LA SECURITE | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/24] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN NETZWERKWEITEN ÜBERWACHUNG UND INTERVENTION BEI EINBRAUCH IN SICHERHEIT | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | [2011/28] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LUNT T F ET AL, "IDES: a progress report (Intrusion-Detection Expert System)", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1990., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH ANNUAL TUCSON, AZ, USA 3-7 DEC. 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19901203), ISBN 0-8186-2105-2, pages 273 - 285, XP010021645 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSAC.1990.143786 | [X] - BAUER D S ET AL, "NIDX-an expert system for real-time network intrusion detection", COMPUTER NETWORKING SYMPOSIUM, 1988., PROCEEDINGS OF THE WASHINGTON, DC, USA 11-13 APRIL 1988, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19880411), ISBN 0-8186-0835-8, pages 98 - 106, XP010011838 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CNS.1988.4983 | [X] - LUNT T F ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Real-time intrusion detection", INTELLECTUAL LEVERAGE. SAN FRANCISCO, FEB. 27 - MAR. 3, 1989, COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (COMPCON), WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19890227), vol. CONF. 34, ISBN 0-8186-1909-0, pages 348 - 353, XP010014771 [X] 1,9,10,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMPCON.1989.301954 | [X] - HEBERLEIN L T ET AL, "A network security monitor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON RESEARCH IN SECURITY AND PRIVACY. OAKLAND, MAY 7 - 9, 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19900507), vol. SYMP. 11, ISBN 0-8186-2060-9, pages 296 - 304, XP010020207 [X] 1,9,10,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RISP.1990.63859 | [X] - ALVES-FOSS J, "An overview of SNIF: a tool for Surveying Network Information Flow", NETWORK AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM SECURITY, 1995., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 16-17 FEB. 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19950216), ISBN 0-8186-7027-4, pages 94 - 101, XP010134536 [X] 1,9,10,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NDSS.1995.390642 | [X] - MCAULIFFE N ET AL, "Is your computer being misused? A survey of current intrusion detection system technology", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1990., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH ANNUAL TUCSON, AZ, USA 3-7 DEC. 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19901203), ISBN 0-8186-2105-2, pages 260 - 272, XP010021644 [X] 1,9,10,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSAC.1990.143785 | International search | [A]US5032979 (HECHT MATTHEW S [US], et al); | [A]US5414833 (HERSHEY PAUL C [US], et al); | [A]US5488715 (WAINWRIGHT PAUL F [US]); | [A]US5557742 (SMAHA STEPHEN E [US], et al); | [AP]US5606668 (SHWED GIL [IL]); | [YP]US5621889 (LERMUZEAUX JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF 13TH NATIONAL COMPUTER SECURITY CONFERENCE, October 1990, WINKLER J.R., "A Unix Prototype for Intrusion and Anomaly Detection in Secure Networks". | [A] - IEEE, January 1992, DEBAR H. et al., "A Neural Network Component for an Intrusion Detection System", pp. 240-250. | [A] - COMPUTER SECURITY JOURNAL, 1989, Vol. 6, No. 1, TENER W.T., "Discovery: An Expert System in the Commercial Data Security Environment". | [A] - IEEE, September 1996, AVRITZER A. et al., "Reliability Testing of Rule-Based Systems", pp. 1-7. |