EP1025536 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING WAVELET-LIKE AND INVERSE WAVELET-LIKE TRANSFORMATIONS OF DIGITAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZORAN CORPORATION 1390 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086-5305 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Zoran Corporation 1390 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086-5305 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Teralogic Inc. 707 California Street Mountain View, CA 94041-2005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUI, Charles, K. Apartment 311, 1450 Oak Creek Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949695.7 | 21.11.1997 | [2000/32] | WO1997US21915 | Priority number, date | US19960758224 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: US 758224 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824053 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025536 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025536 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, G06F17/14 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G10L19/00 (EP,US);
G06F17/148 (EP,US);
H04N19/63 (EP,US);
G10L25/27 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | G06K9/36, G06F17/14 | ||
Former IPC [2000/32] | G06K9/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN WELLENARTIGER UND UMGEKEHRTEN WELLENARTIGEN TRANSFORMATIONEN VON DIGITALEN DATEN | [2000/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING WAVELET-LIKE AND INVERSE WAVELET-LIKE TRANSFORMATIONS OF DIGITAL DATA | [2000/32] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE TRANSFORMATION DE TYPE ONDELETTE OU UNE TRANSFORMATION INVERSE DE TYPE ONDELETTE DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.03.2007 | [2008/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19534943 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,9,13 * abstract ** page 3, column 8 - page 3, column 26 * | International search | [Y]US4974187 (LAWTON WAYNE M [US]); | [Y]US5014134 (LAWTON WAYNE M [US], et al); | [Y]US5412741 (SHAPIRO JEROME M [US]); | [A]US5414780 (CARNAHAN SHAWN V A [US]); | [A]US5526446 (ADELSON EDWARD H [US], et al); | [Y]US5546477 (KNOWLES GREGORY P [ES], et al) |