EP0943214 - METHOD FOR ASSOCIATING ONE DIRECTORY NUMBER WITH TWO MOBILE STATIONS WITHIN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 7001 Development Drive P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. 7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLTZ, David 901 Lochness Lane Garland, TX 75044 / US | 02 /
WESTBROOK, Bret 902 South Delaware Irving, TX 75060 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/38] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97949744.3 | 03.12.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US22189 | Priority number, date | US19960760946 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: US 760946 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9826626 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0943214 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943214 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB [1999/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUORDNUNG EINER EINZIGEN RUFNUMMER AN ZWEI FUNKTELEFONEN IN EINEM MOBILFUNKNETZ | [1999/38] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSOCIATING ONE DIRECTORY NUMBER WITH TWO MOBILE STATIONS WITHIN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [1999/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ASSOCIER UN NUMERO D'ANNUAIRE A DEUX STATIONS MOBILES D'UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9417644 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,12,13,19,21,23 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 12 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 1 * * page 10, line 28 - page 12, line 1 * * page 12, line 20 - page 14, line 14 * * page 15, line 2 - line 26 * * abstract * [A] 9,14-16,20,24; | [XA]WO9535001 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,12,19 * page 3, line 16 - line 32 * * page 5, line 7 - line 17 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 2 * * page 9, line 16 - page 11, line 26 * * page 12, line 32 - page 13, line 10 * * page 13, line 27 - page 15, line 20 * * abstract * [A] 3,5-7,17; | [XA]WO9631073 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,12,19 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 15 * * page 8, line 5 - line 23 * * page 9, line 19 - line 24 * * page 10, line 28 - page 12, line 31 * * page 13, line 12 - line 17 * * abstract *[A] 11,18,22 |