EP1000372 - RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE HAVING A BINDER LAYER CONTAINING AN EPOXY RESIN AND A SILICONE CROSS-LINKED POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRANDALL, Michael, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949757.5 | 04.12.1997 | [2000/20] | WO1997US22245 | Priority number, date | US19970904600 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: US 904600 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906858 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000372 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000372 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/128, C08L83/04, C09D183/04, C07F7/18 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24421 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31518 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31525 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2107 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2115 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/02, C08L63/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINER BINDESCHICHT, DIE EIN EPOXIDHARZ UND EIN SILIKON VERNETZTES PLYMER ENTHÄLT | [2000/20] | English: | RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE HAVING A BINDER LAYER CONTAINING AN EPOXY RESIN AND A SILICONE CROSS-LINKED POLYMER | [2000/20] | French: | ARTICLE RETROREFLECHISSANT POSSEDANT UNE COUCHE DE LIANT CONTENANT UNE RESINE EPOXYDE ET UN POLYMERE DE SILICONE RETICULE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3758192 (BINGHAM W) [A] 1,9,11,14 * column 6, line 30 - line 51; figure 4; examples I,V *; | [AD]US5283101 (LI WU-SHYONG [US]) [AD] 1,9,11,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 27 ** column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 45; figure 2 * |