EP0942934 - RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sugen, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Sugen, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Sugen, Inc. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080-4811 / US | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Sugen, Inc. 351 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063-4720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHO, Keith, E. One Torino Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
PLOWMAN, Gregory, D. 4 Hoveysuckle Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/43] | Nobbe, Matthias, Dr. Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Centroallee 263 46047 Oberhausen / DE | ||
Former [2003/04] | Harrison Goddard Foote Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949790.6 | 21.11.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US22526 | Priority number, date | US19960031675P | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 31675 P | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9822507 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0942934 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942934 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/71 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | REZEPTOR-TYROSINE-KINASE GENE | [1999/38] | English: | RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE GENES | [1999/38] | French: | GENES CODANT LES TYROSINES KINASES RECEPTRICES | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2008 | BE | 02.01.2008 | CH | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IT | 02.01.2008 | LI | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | DE | 03.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/05] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DE | 03.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DE | 03.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4239817 (CHEMOTHERAPEUTISCHES FORSCHUNGSINSTITUT GEORG SPEYER HAUS [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * see the whole document, especially page 3, line 30-36 *; | [Y]WO9525795 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * see the whole document, especially page 3, line 36-page 4, line 45 and page 17, line 14-43 *; | [A]WO9601837 (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X] - ADAMS M D ET AL, "INITIAL ASSESSMENT OF HUMAN GENE DIVERSITY AND EXPRESSION PATTERNS BASED UPON 83 MILLION NUCLEOTIDES OF CDNA SEQUENCE", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19950928), vol. 377, pages 3 - 17, XP002042918 [X] 4-8 | [PX] - EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19970418), XP002062967 [PX] 4-8 * accession nr.: AA322346 * | [PX] - EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19970418), XP002062968 [PX] 4-8 * accession nr.: AA351400 * | [X] - LEE N H ET AL, "COMPARATIVE EXPRESSED-SEQUENCE TAG ANALYSIS OF DIFFERENTIAL GENE EXPRESSION PROFILES IN PC-12 CELLS BEFORE AND AFTER NERVE GROWTH FACTOR TREATMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (199508), vol. 92, pages 8303 - 8307, XP002062373 [X] 4-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.18.8303 | [ ] - EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19950930), XP002062969 [ ] * accession nr.: H31142 * | [X] - HILLIER L ET AL., "Human cDNA clone 270151", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19960127), XP002062583 [X] 4-8 * Accession Nr.: N40710 * | [X] - HILLIER L ET AL., "Human cDNA clone 32217", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19950422), XP002062584 [X] 4-8 * Accession Nr.: R17441 * | [X] - HILLIER L ET AL, "Human cDNA clone 308512", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19960419), XP002062585 [X] 4-8 * Accession Nr.: N95580 * | [X] - HILLIER L ET AL, "Human cDNA clone 265618", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19951230), XP002062586 [X] 4-8 * Accession Nr.: N25321 * | [DA] - HANKS S K ET AL, "THE EUKARYOTIC PROTEIN KINASE SUPERFAMILY: KINASE (CATALYTIC) DOMAIN STRUCTURE AND CLASSIFICATION", FASEB JOURNAL., BETHESDA, MD US, (199505), vol. 9, pages 576 - 596, XP002062374 [DA] 1-20 * page 577 - page 592; figure 1 * * page 595 * | [PX] - GAOZZA E ET AL, "AATYK: A novel tyrosine kinase induced during growth arrest and aptosis of meyloid cells", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19971003), XP002062966 [PX] 4-8 * Accession Nr.: AF011908 * | [ ] - ONCOGENE, (19971218), vol. 15, no. 25, pages 3127 - 3135 |