EP0946272 - PREPARATION OF HOMOGENEOUS GAS MIXTURES WITH SF6 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | PREPARATION OF HOMOGENEOUS GAS MIXTURES WITH SF 6? | ||
[2001/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2002/32] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTROFF, Michael Bronsartstrasse 16 D-30161 Hannover / DE | 02 /
WICKEL, Hans-Peter Magnusstrasse 9/1 D-74206 Bad Wimpfen / DE | 03 /
DISTEL, Reiner Uhland-Strasse 7 D-74206 Bad Wimpfen / DE | 04 /
BELT, Heinz-Joachim Haferkamp 19 D-30938 Burgwedel / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Gosmann, Martin, et al Abbott Products GmbH IP Department (PH-ZP) Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Gosmann, Martin, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung Postfach 220 30002 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 97949955.5 | 19.11.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997DE02710 | Priority number, date | DE1996149254 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19649254 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823363 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946272 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946272 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C01B17/4553 (EP,US);
B01F23/10 (KR);
B01F23/19 (EP,US);
B01F35/2211 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (EP,US);
B01F25/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG HOMOGENER GASGEMISCHE MIT SF6 | [2001/43] | English: | PREPARATION OF HOMOGENEOUS GAS MIXTURES WITH SF6 | [2001/43] | French: | PREPARATION DE MELANGES HOMOGENES DE GAZ COMPRENANT DU SF6 | [2001/43] |
Former [1999/40] | HERSTELLUNG HOMOGENER GASGEMISCHE MIT SF 6? | ||
Former [1999/40] | PREPARATION OF HOMOGENEOUS GAS MIXTURES WITH SF 6? | ||
Former [1999/40] | PREPARATION DE MELANGES HOMOGENES DE GAZ COMPRENANT DU SF 6? | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2255778 (BRITISH OXYGEN CO LTD) [X] 1,11 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, line 11 * * figure .; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4239396 (ARRIBAU JORGE O [US], et al) [Y] 15* abstract *; | [A]US4255124 (BARANOWSKI JR FRANK) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE3611589 (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XY]FR2631856 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 1, line 11 * * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 10 * [Y] 15; | [A]US5145514 (GARIEPY BRUNO [CA], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * figure .; claim 1 * |