EP0964967 - ROOF ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTI Holding + Management AG Brossstrasse 9 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/28] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Uti Holding + Management AG Brossstrasse 9 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Uti Holding + Management AG Bockenheimer Landstrasse 70 60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states D.D.C. Planungs-Entwicklungs-und Management AG Bockenheimer Landstrasse 70 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜTZE, Günter, W. Hauptstrasse 65 D-16548 Glienicke / DE | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 97950024.6 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/51] | WO1997EP05881 | Priority number, date | DE1996144284 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644284 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817880 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964967 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964967 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/35, F24J2/04 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
E04B7/20 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
H02S20/23 (EP);
H02S40/44 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP);
Y02E10/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | DACHELEMENT | [1999/51] | English: | ROOF ELEMENT | [1999/51] | French: | ELEMENT DE TOITURE | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 07.07.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.07.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.07.2001 | GB | 11.07.2001 | IT | 11.07.2001 | NL | 11.07.2001 | SE | 11.10.2001 | AT | 24.10.2001 | BE | 31.10.2001 | CH | 31.10.2001 | LI | 31.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 11.07.2001 | |
GB | 11.07.2001 | ||
NL | 11.07.2001 | ||
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
AT | 24.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
NL | 11.07.2001 | ||
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
AT | 24.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
NL | 11.07.2001 | ||
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
AT | 24.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
NL | 11.07.2001 | ||
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
SE | 11.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 11.10.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2473690 (LEGRIS MARCEL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0126726 (FRELLER WALTER) [A] 1 * the whole document * |