EP0957158 - SHEETLIKE ARTICLE FOR WASHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Hiromitsu, c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 02 /
SAIJO, Hiroyuki, c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 03 /
HANADA, Hirohiko, c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 04 /
NISHI, Toshiki, c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 05 /
NAKAO, Shinji, c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | [2003/46] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Hiromitsu, Kao Corp. Res. Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | ||
02 /
SAIJO, Hiroyuki, Kao Corp. Res. Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | |||
03 /
HANADA, Hirohiko, Kao Corp. Res. Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHI, Toshiki, Kao Corp. Res. Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAO, Shinji, Kao Corp. Res. Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97950419.8 | 26.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997JP04870 | Priority number, date | JP19970010168 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1016897 | [1999/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832835 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957158 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957158 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D1/66 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/66 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D17/044 (EP);
C11D3/001 (EP);
C11D3/3942 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | C11D17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/46] | Title | German: | TUCHÄHNLICHER GEGENSTAND ZUM WASCHEN | [1999/46] | English: | SHEETLIKE ARTICLE FOR WASHING | [1999/46] | French: | ARTICLE EN FORME DE FEUILLE POUR LE LAVAGE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1999 | Translation filed | 19.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPH1072599 ; | [DA]US5202045 (KARPUSIEWICZ WILLIAM M ET AL) [DA] 4,6,9,10 * the whole document * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10072599 A 19980317 (KAO CORP) [E] 4,5,9 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH083120B ; | [X]JPS6414244 ; | [X]JPS638496 ; | [X]JPS6312466 |