EP1050197 - ELECTRONIC BALLAST HAVING AN OSCILLATOR SHUTDOWN CIRCUIT FOR FLUORESCENT TUBES OR LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states So, Gin Pang 2 Macrill Road Markham Ontario L6C 1R3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states So, Gin Pang 2 Macrill Road Markham, Ontario L6C 1R3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951039.3 | 30.12.1997 | [2000/45] | WO1997CA00995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935892 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050197 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H05B41/2985 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES VORSCHALTGERÄT FÜR ENTLADUNGSLAMPEN MIT ABSCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2000/45] | English: | ELECTRONIC BALLAST HAVING AN OSCILLATOR SHUTDOWN CIRCUIT FOR FLUORESCENT TUBES OR LAMPS | [2000/45] | French: | BALLAST ELECTRONIQUE MUNI D'UN CIRCUIT D'ARRET DE L'OSCILLATEUR POUR TUBES OU LAMPES FLUORESCENTS | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0608061 (AMWAY CORP) [Y] 1-4,7,14,15 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 38; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB2229873 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,7,14,15 * page 3, line 36 - page 7, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0696157 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC); | [A]GB2250873 (KOITO MFG CO LTD); | [A]AT380373B (ZUMTOBEL AG) |