EP0941231 - Heteroarylic-arylic diphosphines as chiral ligands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/37] | HETEROARYLIC-ARYLIC DIPHOSPHINES AS CHIRAL LIGANDS | ||
[2001/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMI S.p.A. Via Vadisi, 5 I-03010 Patrica (Frosinone) / IT | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANNICOLO', Francesco Via Alzaia Naviglio Grande, 46 I-20144 Milano / IT | 02 /
BENINCORI, Tiziana Via Pacini, 39 I-20131 Milano / IT | 03 /
ANTOGNAZZA, Patrizia Via A. Volta, 1 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | 04 /
GLADIALI, Serafino Via Sironi, 4 I-07100 Sassari / IT | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Federica, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Trupiano, Federica, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/50] | Trupiano, Federica Brevetti Europa S.r.l., Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/37] | Trupiano, Roberto, et al BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97951200.1 | 14.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997EP06358 | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02424 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: IT MI962424 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822484 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941231 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941231 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/655, B01J31/28, C07F9/6553, C07C45/50, // C07M7/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B01J31/2452 (EP,US);
B01J31/1865 (EP,US);
B01J31/1875 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07C45/505 (EP,US);
C07F15/004 (EP,US);
C07F15/0053 (EP,US);
C07F15/0066 (EP,US);
C07F15/008 (EP,US);
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
C07F15/045 (EP,US);
C07F17/02 (EP,US);
C07F9/65517 (EP,US);
C07F9/655354 (EP,US);
B01J2231/321 (EP,US);
B01J2231/323 (EP,US);
B01J2231/4205 (EP,US);
B01J2231/643 (EP,US);
B01J2231/645 (EP,US);
B01J2531/0286 (EP,US);
B01J2531/821 (EP,US);
B01J2531/822 (EP,US);
B01J2531/824 (EP,US);
B01J2531/827 (EP,US);
B01J2531/828 (EP,US);
B01J2531/847 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | Heteroaryl-Aryl Diphosphine als chirale Liganden | [2001/49] | English: | Heteroarylic-arylic diphosphines as chiral ligands | [2001/49] | French: | Diphosphines du type hétéroarylique-arylique en tant que ligands chiraux | [2001/49] |
Former [1999/37] | HETEROARYL-ARYL DIPHOSPHINE ALS CHIRALE LIGANDEN | ||
Former [1999/37] | HETEROARYLIC-ARYLIC DIPHOSPHINES AS CHIRAL LIGANDS | ||
Former [1999/37] | DIPHOSPHINES DU TYPE HETEROARYLIQUE-ARYLIQUE EN TANT QUE LIGANDS CHIRAUX | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.05.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9216536 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A]EP0643065 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9601831 (ITALFARMACO SUD SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1-35 * the whole document * |