EP0991376 - GRAFT LIGAMENT ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/15] | GRAFT LIGAMENT ANCHOR AND METHOD FOR ATTACHING A GRAFT LIGAMENT TO A BONE | ||
[2003/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sklar, Joseph H. 210 Park Drive Longmeadow, MA 01106 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKLAR, Joseph, H. 210 Park Drive Longmeadow, MA 01106 / US | 02 /
MARTINS, Harold, M. 17 Scribner Park Newton, MA 02116 / US | 03 /
WENSTROM, Richard, F., Jr. 72 Sycamore Street Norwood, MA 02062 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Guido Patentanwalt Montafonstrasse 35 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Engelhardt, Guido, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Montafonstrasse 35 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951497.3 | 26.11.1997 | [2000/15] | WO1997US21910 | Priority number, date | US19960756413 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: US 756413 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823229 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991376 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991376 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/08 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0829 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0852 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0858 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0864 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] | Title | German: | VERANKERUNG FÜR EIN KÜNSTLICHES BAND | [2003/31] | English: | GRAFT LIGAMENT ANCHOR | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE POUR GREFFON DE LIGAMENT | [2003/31] |
Former [2000/15] | VERANKERUNG FÜR EIN KÜNSTLICHES BAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES KÜNSTLICHEN BANDES AN EINEM KNOCHEN | ||
Former [2000/15] | GRAFT LIGAMENT ANCHOR AND METHOD FOR ATTACHING A GRAFT LIGAMENT TO A BONE | ||
Former [2000/15] | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE POUR GREFFON DE LIGAMENT ET PROCEDE DESTINE A FIXER UN GREFFON DE LIGAMENT A UN OS | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.07.2004 | [2005/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE9109381U (ESKA MEDICAL LÜBECK MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH & CO) [X] 1,5,33,34 * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,14; | [XA]US5234430 (HUEBNER RANDALL J [US]) [X] 1,14,16,19,25 * column 3, line 4 - line 7 * * column 3, line 32 - line 36 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 5,6; | [XA]DE4127550 (TELOS HERSTELLUNG UND VERTRIEB [DE]) [X] 1,5,33,34 * figures 1-4 * [A] 5,14; | [XA]US5314427 (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 34 - line 37 * [A] 15; | [A]US5108431 (MANSAT CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-5,7 * figures 2,5,6 * * column 3, line 4 - line 31 * | International search | [A]US4828526 (SCHNEIDER THOMAS P [US], et al); | [A]US5376119 (ZIMMERMANN MARTIN [CH], et al); | [A]US5425767 (STEININGER ROLAND [CH], et al) |