EP1019844 - BAR CODE SYMBOL DRIVEN SYSTEMS FOR ACCESSING INFORMATION RESOURCES ON THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METROLOGIC INSTRUMENTS, INC. Coles Road at Route 42 Blackwood, NJ 08012 / US | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILZ, David, M., Sr. 10 Union Way Sewell, NJ 08080 / US | 02 /
KNOWLES, Carl, Harry 425 E. Linden Street Morristown, NJ 08057 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97951505.3 | 24.11.1997 | [2000/29] | WO1997US21970 | Priority number, date | US19960753367 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 753367 | US19970820540 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: US 820540 | US19970846219 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: US 846219 | US19970869164 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: US 869164 | US19970887785 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: US 887785 | US19970891599 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: US 891599 | US19970905903 | 04.08.1997 Original published format: US 905903 | US19970916694 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: US 916694 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824036 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019844 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06K7/10, G06K7/12, G06K19/06, G06F17/30, G07F17/16 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/9554 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/29] | G06F17/00, G06K7/10, G06K7/12, G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | DURCH STRICHKODIERTE SYMBOLE GESTEUERTE SYSTEME ZUM ZUGANG ZU INFORMATIONSQUELLEN IM INTERNET | [2000/29] | English: | BAR CODE SYMBOL DRIVEN SYSTEMS FOR ACCESSING INFORMATION RESOURCES ON THE INTERNET | [2000/29] | French: | SYSTEMES PILOTES PAR SYMBOLES SOUS FORME DE CODES A BARRES POUR ACCEDER A DES RESSOURCES D'INFORMATION SUR L'INTERNET | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2003 | 30.11.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0465011 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US5331547 (LASZLO GEORGE [US]) [A] 1,5,6,9 * column W *; | [A] - "DISTRIBUTING UNIFORM RESOURCE LOCATORS AS BAR CODE IMAGES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, page 167, XP000556360 [A] 1,2,9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5490217 (WANG YNJIUN P [US], et al); | [YP]US5600833 (SENN JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [YP]US5640193 (WELLNER PIERRE DAVID [US]); | [YE]US5692073 (CASS TODD A [US]) |