EP0967931 - ANATOMICAL RESTORATION DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM FOR POSTERIOR AND ANTERIOR TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daftary, Fereidoun 9001 Wilshire Boulevard, No. 205 Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951598.8 | 24.11.1997 | [2000/01] | WO1997US22514 | Priority number, date | US19960758400 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: US 758400 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823221 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967931 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967931 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/12, A61C8/00 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
A61C8/0066 (EP,US);
A61C8/0018 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0069 (EP,US);
A61C8/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | A61C13/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTATSYSTEM ZUR ANATOMISCHEN RESTORATION VON HINTEREN UND VORDEREN ZÄHNEN | [2000/01] | English: | ANATOMICAL RESTORATION DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM FOR POSTERIOR AND ANTERIOR TEETH | [2000/01] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMPLANT DENTAIRE DE RESTAURATION ANATOMIQUE DE DENTS POSTERIEURES ET ANTERIEURES | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 23.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.01.2006 | [2006/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5246370 (COATOAM GARY W [US]) [Y] 23,25,27-34,46,49-52,56 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 9 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1,9,17,35,58-61; | [Y]US5492471 (SINGER GARY [US]) [Y] 23,25,27-34,46,49-52,56 * column 7, lines 14-50 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 24 * * figures 1-17 * | International search | [Y]US4904187 (ZINGHEIM WILLIAM F [US]); | [Y]US5368483 (SUTTER FRANZ [CH], et al); | [Y]US5316476 (KRAUSER JACK T [US]); | [Y]US5431567 (DAFTARY FEREIDOUN [US]); | [A]US2857670 (KIERNAN JR THOMAS F) | by applicant | US5035619 | US5073111 | US5145372 | US5297963 | US5431567 | US5015186 | US5030095 | US5049074 |