EP1008100 - PREPAID CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STICH, Rebecca 1149 W. Wrightwood Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
RAMSBURG, Douglas 711 East Main Street Thurmont, MD 21788 / US | 03 /
RICE, Ginger, A. 7304 Kelly Store Road Thurmont, MD 21788 / US | 04 /
WANTZ, John, L. 16014 Kelbaugh Road Thurmont, MD 21788 / US | 05 /
DALGAUER, Don 78 Laurelwood Court Rockaway, NJ 07866 / US | 06 /
NASSOIY, Stephen, R. 8903 Higdon Drive Vienna, VA 22182 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/24] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97951720.8 | 15.12.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US23198 | Priority number, date | US19960767543 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: US 767543 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827513 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008100 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008100 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/02 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/041 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3433 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3558 (EP,US);
G07F17/42 (EP,US);
G07F7/02 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VORAUSBEZAHLTE KARTE | [2000/24] | English: | PREPAID CARD | [2000/24] | French: | CARTE DE PREPAIEMENT | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0201410 (ANBAR GASSAN) [A] 1,3-5,8,9,14,18,21 * column 1, line 4 - line 13 * * column 3, line 5 - line 10 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9101538 (CASH CARD SYSTEMS [GB]); | [A]US5251756 (GRANGE KENNETH [GB]) [A] 1,3-6,21 * column 2, line 17 - line 66 * * column 3, line 48 - line 68 * * column 5, line 8 - line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0580280 (AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE [US]) [A] 1,3,8,11,13,21 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - line 30 * * column 8, line 39 - line 52 * * figure 3B * |