EP0951510 - TOUGH REINFORCED POLYESTERS WITH IMPROVED FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Bruce, Connard 132 Peppertree Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
FLORA, Thomas, Eduard 3325 Hull Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 03 /
MINNICK, Larry, Allen 261 Steele Creek Park Road Bristol, TN 37620 / US | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951762.0 | 17.12.1997 | [1999/43] | WO1997US23514 | Priority number, date | US19960032452P | 19.12.1996 Original published format: US 32452 P | US19970988847 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: US 988847 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827159 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951510 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L69/00 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L23/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/43] | Title | German: | ZÄHE VERSTÄRKTE POLYESTER MIT VERBESSERTER FLIESSFÄHIGKEIT | [1999/43] | English: | TOUGH REINFORCED POLYESTERS WITH IMPROVED FLOW | [1999/43] | French: | POLYESTERS RENFORCES TENACES DOTES D'UNE FLUIDITE AMELIOREE | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 08.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0747070 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC.) [X] 1-24,29-64,66-75 * examples 2,4,5,8-10; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0722984 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,25-27,65 * claim 1 * |