EP0954229 - MANUAL DISPENSER OF FUSIBLE SUBSTANCE IN PARTICULAR OF DEPILATORY WAX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONTOUX, Daniel 59, chemin de la Citadelle F-69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | 02 /
LEGRAIN, Marc 3, Lotissement "Les Cerisiers",Le Grand Logis F-01390 Civrieux en Dombes / FR | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69132 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172 69132 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97952067.3 | 15.12.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997FR02308 | Priority number, date | FR19960015686 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615686 | [1999/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826687 | Date: | 25.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954229 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954229 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
A45D26/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LU, NL, PT [1999/45] | Title | German: | HANDBETÄTIGTER AUSGEBER FÜR HEISSSCHMELZENDES MATERIAL, INSBESONDERE FÜR ENTHAARUNGSWACHS | [1999/45] | English: | MANUAL DISPENSER OF FUSIBLE SUBSTANCE IN PARTICULAR OF DEPILATORY WAX | [1999/45] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A MAIN DE MATIERE THERMOFUSIBLE, NOTAMMENT DE CIRE A EPILER | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05193155 ; | [A]US3982669 (MOORE LEO M); | [A]US4344547 (MOORE LEO M); | [A]FR2544699 (FRACO SA [FR]); | [A]US4790458 (MOORE LEO M [US]); | [A]US4807746 (JACOBS WILLIAM A [US]); | [DA]FR2706261 (SEB SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931117), vol. 17, no. 623, Database accession no. (M - 1511), & JP05193155 A 19930803 (RICOH CO.) | by applicant | US1449517 | FR914405 | US3103689 | EP0055157 | FR2520601 | EP0499317 |