EP0886914 - METHOD FOR REGULATING POWER WITHOUT ANALOG CONTROL LOOP AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/40] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMELIN, Jean +di décédé / FR | 02 /
BRUNET, Jean-Thomson-CSF S.C.P.I. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/01] |
Former [1999/01] | Lincot, Georges, et al THOMSON-CSF, Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Protection et Conseil, TPI/PC, 13, av. du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97952074.9 | 16.12.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997FR02315 | Priority number, date | FR19960015742 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615742 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828843 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886914 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886914 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H03G3/3042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSSTEIGERUNG OHNE ANALOGEN REGELKREIS | [1999/01] | English: | METHOD FOR REGULATING POWER WITHOUT ANALOG CONTROL LOOP AND RELATED DEVICE | [1999/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE PUISSANCE SANS BOUCLE D'ASSERVISSEMENT ANALOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5337006 (MIYAZAKI SHINICHI) [X] 1,2,4 * column W *; | [A]EP0688108 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0654899 (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1 * the whole document * |