EP0967929 - SINGLE DOSE DENTAL ADHESIVE DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD AND ADHESIVE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE KERR CORPORATION 1717 West Collins Avenue Orange, CA 92867 / US | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRANITIS, Leo, J., Jr. 1960 Nice Drive Corona, CA 91720 / US | 02 /
NG, Daniel 22640 Weatherly Court Wildomar, CA 92595 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97952186.1 | 14.11.1997 | [2000/01] | WO1997US20773 | Priority number, date | US19960758383 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: US 758383 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823220 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967929 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967929 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06, A61C19/02, A61K6/083 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A61C19/02 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61C5/60 (EP,US);
A61C2202/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/068 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINER EINMAL-DOSIS EINES ZAHNÄRZTLICHEN HAFTMITTELS | [2000/01] | English: | SINGLE DOSE DENTAL ADHESIVE DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD AND ADHESIVE THEREFOR | [2000/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEBIT UNIDOSE D'ADHESIF DENTAIRE, PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT, ET ADHESIF DESTINE A CET EFFET | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03077694.2 / EP1366726 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.11.2004 | [2006/13] | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9603326 (CENTRIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,16,20-26 * page 1, lines 4-14 * * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 10 * * page 21, lines 20-26 * * figures 1-3,10-15 * [A] 17-19; | [YA]US5538129 (CHESTER BRUCE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,24-26 * column 2, lines 51-63 * * column 4, lines 27-57 * * column 7, lines 13-34 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7,12-15; | [DY]DE9202654U (SOGARO VERTRIEB UND VERWALTUNG) [DY] 8,9,16,20-23 * page 2, lines 15-26 * * page 3, lines 6-18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0688541 (HOFACKER ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,24-26 * column 1, lines 28-37 * * figure - * | by applicant | US5348988 |