EP0956690 - EMERGENCY TELEPHONE WITH AUTOMATIC LOW-BATTERY SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. 7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, John, J., Jr. 2408 Canonbie Lane Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952349.5 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US22619 | Priority number, date | US19960759647 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: US 759647 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9825389 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0956690 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956690 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72, H04Q7/32 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72418 (EP,KR,US);
H04M11/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0261 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | NOTRUFTELEFON DAS AUTOMATISCH EINE FAST LEERE BATTERIE SIGNALIERT | [1999/46] | English: | EMERGENCY TELEPHONE WITH AUTOMATIC LOW-BATTERY SIGNALING | [1999/46] | French: | TELEPHONE D'URGENCE POURVU D'UN AVERTISSEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE DECHARGE DE BATTERIE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.03.2004 | FI | 24.03.2004 | FR | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | GB | 04.12.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
FR | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
GB | 04.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
GB | 04.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9306682 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1,7,8,12,13,17-20 * abstract *; | [A]US5461664 (CAPPADONA STEVEN [US]); | [Y]US5570025 (LAURITSEN DAN D [US], et al) [Y] 1,7,8,12,13,17-20 * column 5, paragraph 1; figure 4 * |