EP0941212 - ENANTIOSELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION OF KETONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | |||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Leo-Brandt-Strasse 52425 Jülich / DE | |||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Leo-Brandt-Strasse 52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIFFELS, Guido Kirchstrasse 44 D-53757 St. Augustin-Menden / DE | 02 /
FELDER, Marcel Buhlweg 2 D-5605 Dottikon / DE | 03 /
KRAGL, Udo Artilleriestrasse 48 D-52428 Jülich / DE | 04 /
WANDREY, Christian Wolfshovener Strasse 139 D-52428 Jülich / DE | 05 /
DRAUZ, Karlheinz Zur Marienruhe 13 D-63579 Freigericht / DE | 06 /
BOMMARIUS, Andreas Waidmannstrasse 7-9 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | 07 /
BOLM, Carsten Nizzaallee 44 D-52072 Aachen / DE | 08 /
DERRIEN, Nadine Flat 2,17 Norwich Road Liverpool L15 9HL / GB | [1999/37] | Application number, filing date | 97952786.8 | 20.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997EP06479 | Priority number, date | DE1996147892 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647892 | [1999/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822415 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941212 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941212 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/143, C07C33/20 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
C07C29/143 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/143, C07C33/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1999/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KATALYTISCHEN, ENANTIOSELEKTIVEN REDUKTION VON KETONEN | [1999/37] | English: | ENANTIOSELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION OF KETONES | [1999/37] | French: | REDUCTION CATALYTIQUE ENANTIOSELECTIVE DE KETONES | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - FRANOT C ET AL, "A Polymer-Bound Oxazaborolidine Catalyst: Enantioselective Borane Reductions of Ketones", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (199511), vol. 11, no. 6, page 2755-2766, XP004047982 [DA] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00365-V | [PX] - FELDER M ET AL, "A polymer-enlarged homogeneously soluble oxazaborolidine catalyst for the asymmetric reduction of ketones by borane", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (19970627), vol. 12, no. 8, page 1975-1977, XP004081466 [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(97)00192-4 |