EP1018041 - SCREEN FOR FRONT LASER PROJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | For all designated states HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Ottersberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
For all designated states HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Ottersberg / DE | |||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH 81663 München / DE | ||
For all designated states HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Ottersberg / DE | |||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Ottersberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GNÄDIG, Klaus deceased / DE | 02 /
DAUSMANN, Günther Schlachthausstrasse 7 D-85435 Erding / DE | 03 /
HALLDORSSON, Thorstein Daphnestrasse 15 D-81925 München / DE | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/28] | Frick, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patente Postfach 80 11 09 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952874.2 | 04.12.1997 | [2000/28] | WO1997EP06774 | Priority number, date | DE1997100162 | 07.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19700162 | [2000/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830924 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018041 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018041 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/32, G03B21/60 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G03B21/60 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | BILDSCHIRM FÜR LASERAUFPROJEKTION | [2000/28] | English: | SCREEN FOR FRONT LASER PROJECTION | [2000/28] | French: | ECRAN POUR PROJECTION LASER FRONTALE | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2699289 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 1,4-6,12 * page 4, line 16 - line 27 * * page 5, line 12 - line 14 * * page 6, line 5 - line 10 * * page 7, line 13 - line 36 * * figures 3A,3B,5 * [A] 2,3,14,15; | [Y]DE3419098 (BARTELT HARTMUT DR, et al) [Y] 1,4-6,12 * page 8, line 7 - line 24 * * claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]US4984856 (MOSS GAYLORD E [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 37 - line 52 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2640772 (LUNAZZI JOSE [FR]) [A] 14,15,22 * page 3, line 23 - line 34 * * page 4, line 15 - line 31 *; | [A]US5372900 (MINAMI YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 16 * column 2, line 11 - line 33 *; | [A]US4960311 (MOSS GAYLORD E [US], et al) [A] 22 * column 3, line 39 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0465429 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [A] 23 * page 4, line 49 - line 54 * * figure 1B * |