EP0944941 - DEVICE TO PRODUCE ACTIVE OXYGEN IONS IN THE AIR FOR IMPROVED AIR QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, ES | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMATIVE AG Austrasse 52 Postfach 854 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states T.E.M.! Technische Entwicklungen und Management GmbH Kirchenweg 15 63840 Hausen / DE | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states T.E.M.! Technische Entwicklung und Management GmbH Kirchenweg 15 63840 Hausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMP, Hanns Kirchenweg 15 D-63840 Hausen / DE | 02 /
KIESEWETTER, Olaf Neue Sorge 32 D-98716 Geschwenda / DE | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Mierswa, Klaus Rechtsanwalt + Patentanwalt, Friedrichstr. 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/37] | Thürer, Andreas Patentanwaltskanzlei Goldbacher Strasse 14 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/39] | Mierswa, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97952915.3 | 11.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997EP06925 | Priority number, date | DE19961051402 | 11.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651402 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826482 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944941 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944941 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01T23/00, B60H3/00 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
A61L9/22 (EP,US);
H01T23/00 (KR);
F24F8/192 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Extension states | LT | 08.07.1999 | LV | 08.07.1999 | SI | 08.07.1999 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG AKTIVER SAUERSTOFFIONEN IN DER LUFT FÜR DIE LUFTVERBESSERUNG, MIT EINEM LUFTIONISATOR | [1999/39] | English: | DEVICE TO PRODUCE ACTIVE OXYGEN IONS IN THE AIR FOR IMPROVED AIR QUALITY | [1999/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'IONS D'OXYGENE ACTIFS DANS L'AIR POUR LA PURIFICATION DE L'AIR, AU MOYEN D'UN IONISATEUR D'AIR | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 24.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LK Luftqualität AG Täschmattstrasse 10 6015 Reussbühl / CH Opponent's representative Uhlemann, Henry, et al, et al Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LK Luftqualität AG Täschmattstrasse 10 6015 Reussbühl / CH Opponent's representative Uhlemann, Henry, Dipl. Chem., et al, et al Patentanwalt, Kaluweit & Uhlemann, Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | 01.08.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.02.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.09.2002 | GR | 04.09.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | LU | 11.12.2002 | PT | 13.12.2002 | IE | 11.12.2003 | ES | 12.12.2003 | SE | 12.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | CH | 31.12.2003 | LI | 31.12.2003 | NL | 01.07.2004 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/13] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2003 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2003 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.12.2003 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/51] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
SE | 12.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
LU | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 04.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60185623 ; | [A]CH600250 (BRETON JACQUES LEON GEORGES) [A] 1 * claim 2 *; | [A]US4901194 (STEINMAN ARNOLD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]US4918568 (STONE JUDSON F [US], et al) [A] 1* claims 3,4 *; | [A]WO9322603 (DESOSTAR HOLLAND BVIO [NL], et al) [A] 1 * claim 7 *; | [AP]GB2304576 (RICHARDSON GEORGE [GB], et al) [AP] 1 * claims 8,10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860205), vol. 010, no. 029, Database accession no. (M - 451), & JP60185623 A 19850921 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |