EP0883756 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL RECEIVER WITH CLOSING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Carlos Valéo Management Services Propriété Industrielle,2, rue André Boulle Boîte postale 150, F-94017 Créteil / FR | 02 /
THOMIRE, Sylvain 154, rue Victor Hugo F-92300 Levallois / FR | 03 /
REY, Frédéric 51, rue de la Roquette F-75011 Paris / FR | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 97952979.9 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997FR02386 | Priority number, date | FR19960016028 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9616028 | FR19970015834 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715834 | [1998/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828552 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883756 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883756 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
F16D25/087 (EP,KR);
F16D25/083 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | NEHMER ZYLINDER EINER HYDRAULISCHBETÄTIGUNG EINER KUPPLUNG | [1998/51] | English: | HYDRAULIC CONTROL RECEIVER WITH CLOSING PLATE | [1998/51] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE A PLAQUE DE FERMETURE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2259555 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,11 * page 7, paragraph 3; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0074671 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,11,14 * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [X]DE3043861 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2116282 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 1, line 91 - page 2, line 55; figure 1 *; | [X]US4051937 (GARRETT ROY PETER, et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * column 6, line 13 - line 48; figure 4 * | by applicant | EP0168932 | FR2745616 | FR9611888 |