EP0955930 - ADJUSTABLE OSTEOSYNTHETIC SYSTEM OF THE RACHIS AND POSITIONING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/46] | ADJUSTABLE OSTEOSYNTHETIC SYSTEM OF THE RACHIS | ||
[2002/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker France Zac Paris Nord II, 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Stryker France S.A. Zac Paris Nord II, 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Dimso Distribution Medicale du Sud Ouest ZI de Marticot 33610 Cestas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE COU DIC, Régis 15, avenue Léonard de Vinci F-33160 Saint Médard en Jalles / FR | 02 /
CONCHY, Frédéric 6, rue de Rigoulet F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97952991.4 | 23.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997FR02398 | Priority number, date | FR19960016115 | 27.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9616115 | [1999/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829046 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955930 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955930 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/6408 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/708 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | REGULIERBARE OSTEOSYNTHESEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE WIRBELSÄULE UND POSITIONIERUNGSWERKZEUG | [2002/49] | English: | ADJUSTABLE OSTEOSYNTHETIC SYSTEM OF THE RACHIS AND POSITIONING TOOL | [2002/49] | French: | SYSTEME D'OSTEOSYNTHESE DU RACHIS AVEC REGLAGE EN POSITION ET OUTILLAGE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2002/49] |
Former [1999/46] | REGULIERBARE OSTEOSYNTHESEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE WIRBELSÄULE | ||
Former [1999/46] | ADJUSTABLE OSTEOSYNTHETIC SYSTEM OF THE RACHIS | ||
Former [1999/46] | SYSTEME D'OSTEOSYNTHESE DU RACHIS AVEC REGLAGE EN POSITION | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 16.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | IE | 25.06.2003 | NL | 25.06.2003 | DK | 25.09.2003 | GR | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | SE | 25.09.2003 | LU | 23.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 25.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8712943U (AESCULAP-WERKE AG) [A] 1,2,4,14,15 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9002527 (AUSTRALIAN DEFENCE IND PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE9112466U (HOWMEDICA GMBH) [DA] 1,2,4,14,15 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 6; figure 7 *; | [A]US5395370 (MUELLER WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,14* abstract * |