EP1008101 - CRYPTOGRAPHIC MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecsec, Incorporated 1953 Gallows Road, Suite 220 Vienna, VA 22182 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Tecsec, Incorporated 1953 Gallows Road, Suite 220 Vienna, VA 22182 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACK, Carl, J. 13715 Lewisdale Road Clarksburg, MD 20871 / US | 02 /
SCHEIDT, Edward, M. 1048 Dead Run Lane McLean, VA 22101 / US | 03 /
HERSHLOW, John, H. 310 Snyder Avenue Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Schramm, Michael Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Schramm, Michael, Dr. Bettinger Schneider Schramm, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr.jur., Dipl.-Phys. Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte Bardehle -Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler-Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97953060.7 | 20.11.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US21809 | Priority number, date | US19960031283P | 20.11.1996 Original published format: US 31283 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9822914 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008101 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K19/073, G07F7/10 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K19/06 (KR);
G06K19/086 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G07F7/082 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | RO | 17.06.1999 | Title | German: | KRYPTOGRAFISCHES MEDIUM | [2000/24] | English: | CRYPTOGRAPHIC MEDIUM | [2000/24] | French: | SUPPORT CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0583709 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract ** column 1, line 33 - line 37 * | International search | [Y]US4822988 (GLOTON JEAN P [FR]); | [Y]US4825283 (SHINO KATSUHIDE [JP]); | [Y]US4835846 (JUAN ALAIN [CH], et al); | [Y]US4839504 (NAKANO HARUMI [JP]); | [Y]US5049728 (ROVIN GEORGE H [US]); | [Y]US5444222 (INOUE TAKESHI [JP]); | [XP]US5612532 (IWASAKI HIROSHI [JP]) |