EP1007298 - APPARATUS FOR SHEARING MULTI-WALLED WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fasske, Wayne, C. 34 Desorbo Drive Southington, CT 06489 / US | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Gerbaulet, Hannes Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97953501.0 | 23.12.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US24042 | Priority number, date | US19960777939 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: US 777939 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828114 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007298 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/02, B23D23/00, B23D23/02 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B23D23/00 (EP,US);
B23D23/02 (EP,US);
B23D35/001 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7493 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7513 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7573 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7647 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRENNEN VON MEHRWANDIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN | [2000/24] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SHEARING MULTI-WALLED WORKPIECES | [2000/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE CISAILLEMENT DE PIECES A PAROIS MULTIPLES | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/09] | Divisional application(s) | EP03018014.5 / EP1366844 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.09.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | 22.09.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | 22.09.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | 22.09.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | 22.09.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.09.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1884001 (LEWIS WALTER V) [X] 1,2,14,15 * page 1, line 50 - page 3, line 73; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3-8,10,12,16,17,19-21; | [Y]GB2126938 (LABOUNTY ROY E) [Y] 3,5,16 * page 2, line 72 - line 89; figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US4872384 (BORZYM JOHN J [US]) [Y] 4,6-8,17 * column 3, line 48 - column 7, line 35; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE199416 (KRUEGER) [Y] 10,12,19-21 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 14; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US4872384 (BORZYM JOHN J [US]); | [Y]US1884001 (LEWIS WALTER V); | [A]US5161444 (KUSAKABE RYOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US3851557 (VIERSTRAETE J); | [A]US4848723 (BORZYM JOHN J [US]) |