EP0964793 - DRAWING OR PAINTING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eichinger, Hartmut Birkenstrasse 9 D-97285 Röttingen / DE | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Postfach 63 23 97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97953667.9 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/51] | WO1997DE03008 | Priority number, date | DE19971006178 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706178 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835839 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964793 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964793 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B43L5/02, A47D3/00 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A47D3/00 (EP,US);
B43L5/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1999/51] | Title | German: | ZEICHEN- ODER MALPLATTE | [1999/51] | English: | DRAWING OR PAINTING BOARD | [1999/51] | French: | PLANCHE POUR LE DESSIN OU LA PEINTURE | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 01.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | FR | 31.12.2003 | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/22] | AT | 19.12.2003 | |
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 31.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1561888 (BREMSHEY & CO) [X] 1,4 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]DE2533493 (BACHLEY PETER V) [A] 1,9,10,12,15* page 5, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [X]GB2207891 (CARNATION OF CUMBERLAND LIMITE) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 23; figure - *; | [X]FR2642368 (DERRIEN CATHERINE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 5; figure - *; | [X]WO9425294 (BOYD STEVEN L [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 13; figures 1-4 * |