EP0973484 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS FOR RECONSTITUTING LAMELLARITY OF THE LIPID STRUCTURE OF DAMAGED SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDAT, Pascal Les Vignalis F-31130 Flourens / FR | 02 /
ORTANDERL, Stefanie Keltenstrasse 61 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | 03 /
KAMPMANN, Martina Rheinstrasse 14 D-41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 04 /
WALDMANN-LAUE, Marianne Mozartstrasse 25 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
KNÜBEL, Georg Karlsruherstrasse 19 D-40229 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
MAUSBERG, Marcus Schelmenwasen 21 D-72160 Mühlen / DE | [2000/04] | Application number, filing date | 97953710.7 | 28.11.1997 | [2000/04] | WO1997EP06639 | Priority number, date | DE19971013793 | 03.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19713793 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844896 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973484 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973484 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/48, A61K9/107 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/0295 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/1274 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSIONEN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER LAMELLARITÄT DER LIPIDSTRUKTUR GESCHÄDIGTER HAUT | [2000/04] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS FOR RECONSTITUTING LAMELLARITY OF THE LIPID STRUCTURE OF DAMAGED SKIN | [2000/04] | French: | EMULSIONS HUILE DANS L'EAU POUR LA RESTITUTION DE LA LAMELLARITE DE LA STRUCTURE LIPIDIQUE DE LA PEAU ENDOMMAGEE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 03.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
30.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE BASF Personal Care and Nutrition GmbH Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim / DE | 02
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
30.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE BASF Personal Care and Nutrition GmbH Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
02
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | |||
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
30.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cognis GmbH Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Reinhardt, Jürgen, et al, et al Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | |||
Former [2007/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
30.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cognis GmbH Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Reinhardt, Jürgen, et al, et al Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | |||
Former [2005/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2005
30.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | 12.05.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.03.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 08.03.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/23] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 12.08.2009 | Appeal received No. T1718/09 | 07.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.03.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.07.2004 | IE | 07.07.2004 | DK | 07.10.2004 | GR | 07.10.2004 | SE | 07.10.2004 | PT | 07.12.2004 | AT | 28.11.2009 | IT | 28.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | NL | 01.06.2010 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/45] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
PT | 07.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.11.2009 | ||
NL | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
PT | 07.12.2004 | ||
AT | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2008/08] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
PT | 07.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
IE | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 07.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0217105 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - * * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 15 *; | [A]EP0312343 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 15 *; | [DA]EP0641557 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1,5,6 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 36 - line 37 *; | [A]DE4337041 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [E]WO9807406 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 6 * * page 4, line 8 - line 31 * * page 10, line 32 - line 35 * |