EP0946099 - ENDOPARASITICIDAL AND ECTOPARASITICIDAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bayer Animal Health GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIRINYAN, Kirkor Humperdinckstrasse 12 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
DORN, Hubert Pahlkestrasse 71 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
HEESCHEN, Kerstin Am Falkenberg 4 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
HEUKAMP, Ulrich Am Domberg 2 D-51515 Kürten / DE | 05 /
KUJANEK, Richard Wolfskaul 3 D-51061 Köln / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/51] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/42] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97953783.4 | 11.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP06926 | Priority number, date | DE19961054079 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19654079 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827817 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946099 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946099 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A61K31/70, A61K31/365, // (A01N43/90, 61:00, 57:24, 51:00, 47:44, 47:40, 43:86, 43:78) | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N61/00, A01N57/24, A01N51/00, A01N47/44, A01N47/40, A01N43/86, A01N43/78, A01N43/54, A01N43/50, A01N43/40 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1999/40] | A01N43/90, A61K31/70, A61K31/365, // (A01N43/90, 61:00, 57:24, 51:00, 47:44, 47:40, 43:86, 43:78) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2015/16] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ENDO-EKTO-PARASITIZIDE MITTEL | [1999/40] | English: | ENDOPARASITICIDAL AND ECTOPARASITICIDAL AGENTS | [1999/40] | French: | AGENTS ENDOPARASITICIDES ET ECTOPARASITICIDES | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Observations by third parties | 20.02.2014 | Observations by third parties | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2014 | Observations by third parties | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Observations by third parties | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2000 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]ZA842571 ; | [X]GB2221621 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9533453 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * page 1 - page 10, line 20 * * page 16, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [X]DE19519007 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * siehe Seite 2, Zeilen 9-36 und 43; page 2, line 62 - page 4, line 60; claim - *; | [Y]WO9638165 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * page 1 - page 3, line 15 * * page 3, line 16 - page 6 *; | [E]EP0836851 (VIRBAC SA [FR]) [E] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 34; claim 13 * * page 3, line 22 - line 50 * * page 4, line 33 - line 42 * * page 7, line 2 - line 21 ** page 7, line 25 - line 39 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (19860423), vol. 86, no. 09, Database accession no. 86-061936, XP002064421 & ZA8402571 A 19851007 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - I.D. HARROW & K.A.F. GRATION, "Mode of Action of the Anthelminitcs Morantel, Pyrantel and Levamisole on Muscle Cell Membrane of the Nematode Ascaris suum", PESTICIDE SCIENCE, BARKING GB, (1985), vol. 16, pages 662 - 72, XP002064420 [A] 1 * siehe Seite 662, die Zusammenfassung und Seiten 670-671, Abschnitt 'disussion' * | Examination | US4199569 | ZA842571 | WO9617520 | - WESLEY L. SHOOP ET AL, "Structure and activity of avermectins and milbemycins in animal health", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, (19950901), vol. 59, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0304-4017(94)00743-V, ISSN 0304-4017, pages 139 - 156, XP055091744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4017(94)00743-V | by applicant | EP0059074 | GB2213722 | GB2224933 | EP0423445 | GB2252730 | DE19519007 | - H. G. DAVIES ET AL., "Avermectins and Milbemycins Part II", CHEM. SOC. REV., (1991), vol. 20, pages 271 - 339 | - G. T. CARTER ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COM-MUN., (1987), pages 402 - 404 | - A. C. GOUDIE ET AL., "Doramectin - a potent novel endectozide", VET. PARASITOL., (1993), vol. 49, pages 5 - 15 | other | US4199569 | WO9617520 | WO9638165 | US5712295 | EP0836851 | US6001858 | US6159932 | US6444690 |